+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/15/2022
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/8/2022
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction