+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 543
- Effective date(s) 03/09/2018
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/12/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2018
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/6/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/31/2018
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (8)
February 22, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 12, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
February 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
February 12, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
February 6, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 6, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
January 31, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
January 31, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor