+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/1/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/21/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/15/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Ref. to Health Committee-- Criminal Justice Committee
- P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 1, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 21, 2017: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee
February 21, 2017: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee
February 15, 2017: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
February 15, 2017: HOUSE HEATH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor