+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Failed In s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/26/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/12/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor