+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 137
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/5/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/27/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.