+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 5/28/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Business Subcommittee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/18/2020
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor