+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 985
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next calendar
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/2/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/26/2014
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/4/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/19/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/12/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA1294
Amendment 1-0 to HB1679
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 26, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor