+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Education Instruction & Programs
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Instruction & Programs to 3/1/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/16/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
February 10, 2016: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor