+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 245
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 31, 2021: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 23, 2021: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor