+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/8/2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2022
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 8, 2022: HOUSE TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 1, 2022: HOUSE TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor