+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/30/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/30/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Local Government Subcommittee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee--Finance, Ways & Means
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor