+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2016
- Reset on cal. for 2/25/2016
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/18/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/11/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/9/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/3/2016
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 9, 2016: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 3, 2016: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor