+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 607
- Effective date(s) 04/04/2014
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/24/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/18/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
February 18, 2014: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor