+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 502
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/12/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2018
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/7/2018
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
February 8, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar
February 8, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar
February 7, 2018: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 7, 2018: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor