+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 156
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/30/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/16/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/9/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (6)
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
April 5, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 30, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 16, 2021: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 3, 2021: HOUSE PUBLIC SERVICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor