+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 712
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2018
- Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/7/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/27/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Government Operations for Review
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 22, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 22, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 14, 2018: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 14, 2018: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 27, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
February 27, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
February 21, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
February 21, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor