+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor