+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 528
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 4
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0493)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0522)
- Passed H. as Am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/11/2020
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/4/2020
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 1