+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 556
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/18/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/11/2016
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 1/26/2016
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2016: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor