+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor