+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 5/26/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 9, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
May 26, 2020: HOUSE K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor