+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/10/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/3/2016
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
February 10, 2016: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor