+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 612
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/27/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 2/27/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/20/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/13/2018
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 8, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 27, 2018: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 27, 2018: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 13, 2018: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
February 13, 2018: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor