+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider failed.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/15/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/15/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/8/2022
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 30, 2021: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor