+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 857
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2015
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Governor returned.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1070)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0965)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/1/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/26/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/26/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 30
April 8, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
April 8, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 8, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 1, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE
March 26, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor