+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
- Placed behind the budget
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction