+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/2/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA1139
Amendment 1-0 to HB1551
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 26, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor