+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.