+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/2/2022
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to First Calendar 2022
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor