+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 868
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/25/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA1021
Amendment 1-0 to HB1542
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 8, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 2, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 25, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
March 19, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (45)
Bailey
Type:
Primary Sponsor