+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 616
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/4/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/25/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/19/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee --Government Operations for review
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0755
Amendment 1-0 to HB1539
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 11, 2014: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE
February 19, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor