+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor