+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 240
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 HB0153
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/8/2015
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0168)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0036)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 2
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/18/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/10/2015
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/4/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Criminal Justice Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (13)
April 8, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 33