+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 950
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- All added as Sponsors
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/25/2014
- Assigned to s/c Government Operations Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/11/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/5/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0612
Amendment 1-0 to HB1528
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 9, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
February 25, 2014: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
February 11, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 5, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (117)
Type:
Primary Sponsor