+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 772
- Effective date(s) 04/24/2014
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/11/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93