+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Pr. Ch. 11
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0292)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/9/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/2/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 33
April 17, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
April 17, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 9, 2019: HOUSE NAMING, DESIGNATING, & PRIVATE ACTS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor