+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 349
- Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 4, PNV 2
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0280)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/17/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 4/3/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
- Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 33
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 17, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 3, 2019: HOUSE LOCAL COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 27, 2019: HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor