+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 727
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/6/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 1/31/2018
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (9)
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
March 27, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 27, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 21, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 21, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 6, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 6, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
January 31, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
January 31, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor