+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 5
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0004)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/19/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
February 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97