+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/21/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- Ref. to Health Committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 4, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 27, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 21, 2021: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 6, 2021: HOUSE HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor