+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 405
- Effective date(s) 05/17/2019; 07/01/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1,2,&3 Ayes 98, Nays 0 PNV 0
- H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/30/19
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA0438)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0435)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0434)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0433)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0463)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0467)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0466)
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 4/24/2019
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2019
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/23/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/23/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (6)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 11
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 1,2 & 3 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 23, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 23, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor