+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2016
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2016
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/17/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/9/2016
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 18, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 18, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 17, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 9, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor