+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 527
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/13/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/7/2018
- Roll 2 weeks places
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 1/24/2018
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 22, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 13, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 13, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 7, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
February 7, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor