+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 578
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/14/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Intro., P1C.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction