+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
- Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 27, 2019: HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor