+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 768
- Effective date(s) 05/01/2014
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 79, Nays 9, PNV 2
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/3/2014
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 28, Nays 2
- S. adopted am. 1
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 6, PNV 1
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/12/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/5/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
April 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 5, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor