+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/6/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/6/2018
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/30/2018
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2018: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
February 27, 2018: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor