+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 5/28/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor