+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/8/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2017
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 8, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 28, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 28, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor