+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/1/2016
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/1/2016
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/23/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/17/2016
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 1, 2016: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 17, 2016: TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor